Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/03/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 06/09/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/17/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 07/16/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/31/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 10/01/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 12/09/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 01/26/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/13/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/29/2010