Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 05/21/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/03/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/16/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 06/16/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 06/17/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/09/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/07/2009