Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 05/21/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/02/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/02/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 06/02/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/02/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 06/09/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 06/09/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/09/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/09/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/09/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/09/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/27/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/27/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/09/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 09/09/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/16/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/17/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/25/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/29/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/07/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/01/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 01/13/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 01/20/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/02/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/09/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 03/09/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/13/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/28/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/28/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 04/28/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/13/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/13/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/26/2010

Show cosponsors who withdrew