Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 05/21/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/31/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/31/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/31/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/09/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/01/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 10/07/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 10/07/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/08/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/14/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/14/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 10/29/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 12/15/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/27/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/27/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 01/27/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 01/27/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 01/27/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/27/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 01/27/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/27/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 01/27/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 01/27/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/27/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 01/27/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 01/27/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/02/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/02/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/02/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/02/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/04/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/04/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/04/2010