Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/16/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/24/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/24/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/24/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/14/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/16/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/16/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/20/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/21/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/24/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 09/08/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/19/2010