Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/10/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/18/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/08/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/22/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/02/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 09/29/2010
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/29/2010