Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/18/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/18/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/18/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/18/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/18/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 06/24/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 07/15/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/15/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/15/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/15/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/15/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/17/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 07/17/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/17/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/17/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/17/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/24/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 07/24/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 07/24/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/31/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/08/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/10/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 09/30/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/30/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 10/07/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/08/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 10/13/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 10/13/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/14/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/02/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 01/26/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 09/14/2010