Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 05/21/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/21/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/21/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/02/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 06/02/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/04/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/04/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/12/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/24/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/24/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/26/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/10/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/13/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/20/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/30/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/08/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 09/08/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/08/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/14/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/16/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/22/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/23/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/25/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/25/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/29/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/29/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/30/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 10/01/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/06/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/14/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/14/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/14/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/15/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/15/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/20/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 10/21/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/21/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/23/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 11/02/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/02/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/04/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 11/06/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/10/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 01/12/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/12/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 01/12/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 01/19/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/19/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 01/21/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/21/2010
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/22/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/02/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 04/20/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/21/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/15/2010