Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/19/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/17/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/17/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/31/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/25/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 10/27/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/27/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/02/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/02/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/02/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 11/02/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 11/05/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/18/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/18/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/18/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/16/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 12/16/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 12/19/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/19/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/12/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/26/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/24/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/17/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/20/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/19/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/24/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/09/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/09/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 06/09/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/30/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/30/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/20/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/27/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/15/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/15/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/29/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 11/16/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/16/2010