Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 05/21/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 07/09/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 07/14/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 10/28/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/27/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/20/2010