Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/03/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/03/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/04/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/04/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/08/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/08/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/18/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/18/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/18/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/18/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/18/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/07/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/07/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/09/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 07/22/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/22/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/22/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/22/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/01/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/01/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/13/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/22/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 01/26/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/26/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/12/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/25/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 04/15/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/27/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/12/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 09/23/2010