Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 11/17/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/17/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/16/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/16/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/16/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/16/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/16/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/16/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/16/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/16/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/16/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/16/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 03/16/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/16/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/16/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/16/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/16/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 03/16/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/16/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 03/16/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/16/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 03/16/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/16/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/16/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 03/18/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 03/18/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/18/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/18/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 03/18/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 07/14/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/19/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/20/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/22/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 07/22/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 07/22/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/22/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/22/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/22/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/26/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/28/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 09/14/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/14/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 09/23/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/29/2010