Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 05/21/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/21/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/04/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 06/04/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/04/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/04/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/04/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/04/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/04/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/04/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/09/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/09/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 06/11/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/11/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/11/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 06/11/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/11/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/11/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 06/11/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/11/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/11/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 06/11/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/11/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/11/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/11/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/26/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/26/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 07/14/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/17/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/24/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/06/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 10/21/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/28/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 11/03/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/03/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/03/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 11/03/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/03/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 11/03/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/04/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 11/04/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 11/07/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 11/17/2009