Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/21/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 06/16/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/24/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/02/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/02/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/02/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/22/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/29/2010