Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/10/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 07/08/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/10/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/15/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/21/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/30/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 09/09/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/14/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 09/25/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/25/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 10/08/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 11/05/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/14/2010