Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/10/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 09/16/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 10/14/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 10/21/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 10/21/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 10/21/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/22/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/22/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 10/22/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 11/04/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/06/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 11/17/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 11/19/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/01/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 12/03/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 12/15/2009