Refine your search

Showing 6 of 6 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
07/27/2009 Became Public Law No: 111-41.
07/27/2009 Signed by President.
07/27/2009 Presented to President.
07/24/2009 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8101)
07/21/2009 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 421 - 0 (Roll no. 604).(text: CR 7/20/2009 H8379)
05/21/2009 Introduced in House