Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 05/21/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/15/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/16/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/24/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/07/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/08/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/08/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/08/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/08/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/08/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 07/08/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/10/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/10/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/10/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/10/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 07/10/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/10/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/10/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/10/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/10/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 07/13/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/13/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 07/13/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/13/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/13/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/13/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/13/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/13/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/13/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/13/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/13/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/13/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 07/13/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/13/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 07/14/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/14/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 07/14/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/14/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/14/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/14/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/14/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/14/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/14/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/17/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/17/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/17/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/17/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/17/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/17/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 07/17/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 07/17/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/17/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 07/17/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/17/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/20/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 07/20/2009