Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/15/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 06/25/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/25/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 07/15/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 10/23/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/27/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 10/29/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 11/06/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/27/2010