There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the President to award a gold medal on behalf of Congress to Muhammad Ali in recognition of his contributions to the Nation.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/02/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/02/2009Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/02/2009Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H6081)
Action By: House of Representatives
06/02/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (90)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/02/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/03/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/03/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/03/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/04/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/09/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/09/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/09/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/09/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 06/09/2009
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 06/09/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/09/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 06/11/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/11/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/11/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/15/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/15/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/15/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/16/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 06/16/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/16/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/16/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/17/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/17/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/18/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/18/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/19/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/19/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/23/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/23/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/25/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/07/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/13/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/13/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/15/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/15/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/15/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/15/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 07/16/2009
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/16/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/21/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/23/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/29/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 09/29/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/06/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/28/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 10/28/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 11/05/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 11/16/2009
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 11/16/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/14/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/19/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/22/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/22/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/27/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/28/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/30/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 08/10/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services06/02/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2648.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2648. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/02/2009)

Directs the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the President Pro Tempore of the Senate to make arrangements for the presentation of a congressional gold medal to Muhammad Ali in recognition of his contributions to the nation.