Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/02/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/03/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/03/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/03/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/04/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/09/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/09/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/09/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/09/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 06/09/2009
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 06/09/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/09/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 06/11/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/11/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/11/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/15/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/15/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/15/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/16/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 06/16/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/16/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/16/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/17/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/17/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/18/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/18/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/19/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/19/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/23/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/23/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/25/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/07/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/13/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/13/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/15/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/15/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/15/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/15/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 07/16/2009
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/16/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/21/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/23/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/29/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 09/29/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/06/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/28/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 10/28/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 11/05/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 11/16/2009
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 11/16/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/14/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/19/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/22/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/22/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/27/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/28/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/30/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 08/10/2010