Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/03/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/03/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/03/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/03/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/03/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/03/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/03/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/03/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/03/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/03/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/03/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/03/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/04/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/09/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/10/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/02/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/03/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/03/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/03/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/03/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/03/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/03/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/04/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/04/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/06/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/16/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/21/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/22/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/23/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/29/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/04/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/04/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/04/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/04/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/24/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/24/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/24/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/24/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/24/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/24/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/24/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/24/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/24/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/24/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/24/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/24/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/07/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/07/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/08/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/27/2009

Show cosponsors who withdrew