There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Act of 2004 Extension Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Act of 2004 Extension Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Act of 2004 Extension Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Act of 2004 Extension Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title II of the Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Act of 2004 to extend the operation of such title for a 1-year period ending June 22, 2010.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
06/19/2009Became Public Law No: 111-30. (TXT | PDF)
06/19/2009Signed by President.
06/19/2009Presented to President.
06/17/2009Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6741)
06/09/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6329)
06/03/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
06/19/2009Became Public Law No: 111-30. (TXT | PDF)
06/19/2009Signed by President.
06/19/2009HousePresented to President.
06/18/2009SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/17/2009SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6741)
06/10/2009SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
06/09/2009-1:53pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/09/2009-1:53pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6329)
06/09/2009-1:47pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2675.
06/09/2009-1:47pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6329-6330)
06/09/2009-1:47pmHouseMr. Johnson (GA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/03/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
06/03/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/03/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/03/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/03/2009

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary06/03/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.2675. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-30 (06/19/2009)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Act of 2004 Extension Act - Amends the Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Act of 2004 to extend through June 22, 2010, provisions of that Act limiting civil damages in antitrust enforcement actions involving conduct covered by antitrust leniency agreements.