Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 06/04/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 06/11/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/15/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 06/26/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/26/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 07/07/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 07/14/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/31/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/09/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 12/03/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/21/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 03/12/2010