Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/21/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/14/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/04/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/24/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/24/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/24/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/20/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/23/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/27/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/01/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 10/28/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 10/28/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/28/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 10/28/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/28/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 10/28/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/28/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 10/28/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/28/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 11/03/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 11/03/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/03/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 11/03/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 11/16/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 11/16/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 11/16/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 12/16/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 12/16/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 01/27/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/30/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/30/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 12/09/2010