Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 06/03/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/08/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/13/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/13/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/08/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/29/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/17/2009