Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/23/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/23/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/24/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/24/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/24/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/24/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 06/26/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/26/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/26/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/07/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/07/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/10/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/14/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/14/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/22/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 09/09/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/22/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/22/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/01/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 12/01/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 02/23/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 03/04/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/04/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/09/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/09/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 03/09/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/25/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 04/21/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 04/21/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 04/21/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/21/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/05/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/05/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 05/19/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 05/19/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/19/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/19/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/19/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/14/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/23/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 06/23/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/25/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/25/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 06/29/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 07/19/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/19/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/19/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 07/21/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 09/29/2010