Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/26/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/26/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/09/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/16/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/16/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/30/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/30/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 09/09/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/16/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/29/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 09/29/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 09/29/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/01/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/13/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/26/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/26/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/26/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/26/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 10/28/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/29/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 10/29/2009
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 11/03/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 11/04/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 11/04/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 11/04/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/04/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 11/07/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 11/07/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 11/17/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/17/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/17/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/17/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 11/17/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 11/17/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 11/17/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/01/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 12/09/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 12/09/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 12/10/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 12/15/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/15/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/13/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 01/21/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 09/28/2010
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/28/2010