There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Armed Forces Behavioral Health Awareness Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To improve the mental health care benefits available to members of the Armed Forces, to enhance counseling available to family members of members of the Armed Forces, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/04/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
03/25/2010Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
06/24/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
06/05/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/04/2009Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
Action By: House of Representatives
06/04/2009Referred to House Armed Services
Action By: House of Representatives
06/04/2009Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/04/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives
06/03/2009Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2698)
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/26/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/26/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/26/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/09/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/16/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/16/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/29/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/30/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/30/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 09/09/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/16/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 09/29/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 09/29/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/01/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/13/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/27/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 10/28/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 11/03/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/17/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/17/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/17/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 11/17/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 11/17/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 11/17/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 11/19/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/01/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 12/09/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/10/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 12/15/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/15/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 12/16/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/13/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 01/21/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/04/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 09/28/2010

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services06/04/2009 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel06/24/2009 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs06/04/2009 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health06/05/2009 Referred to
03/25/2010 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.2699.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2699. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/04/2009)

Armed Forces Behavioral Health Awareness Act - Makes any member of the Armed Forces who is deployed in support of Operations Iraqi Freedom or Enduring Freedom eligible for readjustment counseling and related mental health services through Vet Centers (centers for such counseling and services for veterans), regardless of the member's duty status.

Directs the Secretary of Defense to award grants to nonprofit organizations that provide emotional support services for family members of members of the Armed Forces, including members of the reserves.

Requires the Secretary of the Army to carry out a pilot program to enhance awareness of post-traumatic-stress-disorder (PTSD) among members of the Army.