Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 02/03/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/12/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/12/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/13/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/13/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 02/23/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/23/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/23/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/23/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 02/23/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/23/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/23/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/26/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/26/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/03/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/03/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/03/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/03/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/04/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/04/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/09/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 03/09/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 03/09/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 03/09/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/09/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/16/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/16/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/16/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/16/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/17/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/19/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/19/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/19/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/19/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 03/23/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/23/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/26/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/01/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 04/01/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/02/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/22/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/22/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/22/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 04/22/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/22/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/22/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/27/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 04/27/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/28/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/28/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 04/29/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/04/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/04/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/06/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/06/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/14/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/02/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/10/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 06/16/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/24/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/24/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 07/08/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/07/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 11/18/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/01/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/08/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/27/2010