Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/07/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/08/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 07/09/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/14/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 09/21/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/07/2009