Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/04/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 06/04/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/04/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/08/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/08/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/10/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/10/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/16/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/25/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/13/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/15/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/17/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/20/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/20/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/24/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/27/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 07/31/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/08/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/08/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/08/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/08/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 11/03/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/16/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/08/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/11/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 12/11/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/20/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 08/10/2010