Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 06/04/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/04/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/23/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/23/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/23/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/23/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/23/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/23/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/23/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/08/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/08/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/08/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/08/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/08/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/08/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/29/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/07/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/07/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 11/19/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 11/19/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 12/16/2009