Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 06/04/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 06/04/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/08/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/08/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/10/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/10/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/26/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/26/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/26/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/28/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/22/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 10/27/2009