Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/26/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/26/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 01/28/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/04/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/04/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/04/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/11/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 02/26/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/26/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/26/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/26/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/26/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/05/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/05/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/05/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 03/10/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/10/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/12/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/12/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/16/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/19/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/19/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/19/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/23/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 03/23/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/23/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/23/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/25/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/01/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/23/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 04/23/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 04/23/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 06/10/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/15/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 06/15/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/27/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 07/27/2009
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/31/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/14/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/17/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/22/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 10/14/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/26/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 10/26/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 11/02/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 11/05/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/05/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/16/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 11/16/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/16/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 12/01/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/01/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 12/09/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/09/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 12/10/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 12/10/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 12/16/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/13/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 01/21/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 01/26/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 02/02/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/02/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/03/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/13/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/26/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/08/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/22/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/20/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 08/10/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/23/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 11/16/2010