Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/12/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/12/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/12/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/15/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/15/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/15/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/15/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/17/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/18/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/23/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/23/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/23/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/23/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/23/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/24/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/24/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/07/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/15/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/21/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/24/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/08/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/08/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/15/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/15/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/04/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/04/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/04/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/22/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/19/2010