Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/04/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/11/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/11/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/11/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/11/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/11/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/19/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/19/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/19/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/19/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/19/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/19/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/20/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/13/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/13/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/13/2010