There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Child Protection Compact Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide United States assistance for the purpose of eradicating trafficking in children in eligible countries through the implementation of Child Protection Compacts, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/04/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
06/04/2009Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/04/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (117)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 06/04/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 06/04/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/04/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/10/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/31/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/31/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/31/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/31/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/31/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/31/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/31/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/08/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/08/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/08/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/08/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/08/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/08/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/08/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/08/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/08/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 09/08/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/08/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 09/08/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/08/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/08/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/08/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/08/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 09/22/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/22/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/22/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 09/22/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/22/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 09/22/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/22/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 09/22/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/22/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/22/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/07/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 10/07/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/22/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/22/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 10/22/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 10/22/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/22/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/22/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/22/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 10/22/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/03/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/03/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/03/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/03/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/03/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/03/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 11/07/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/19/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 11/19/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 11/19/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/13/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 02/03/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/03/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/09/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 03/09/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/12/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/12/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/15/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/15/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/15/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 04/15/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 04/21/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 04/21/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/21/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/21/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/29/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/29/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 04/29/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/12/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 11/15/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/15/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 11/15/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/15/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/15/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/15/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 11/15/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs06/04/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2737. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/04/2009)

Child Protection Compact Act of 2009 - Authorizes the Secretary of State, through the Ambassador-at-Large of the Department of State's Office to Monitor and Combat Trafficking in Persons, to provide assistance (grants, cooperative agreements, or contracts) for an eligible country with a significant prevalence of trafficking in children that enters into a Child Protection Compact with the United States to support policies and programs to eradicate the trafficking of children.