Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 06/04/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 06/04/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/04/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/10/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/31/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/31/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/31/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/31/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/31/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/31/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/31/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/08/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/08/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/08/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/08/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/08/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/08/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/08/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/08/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/08/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 09/08/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/08/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 09/08/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/08/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/08/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/08/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/08/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 09/22/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/22/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/22/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 09/22/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/22/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 09/22/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/22/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 09/22/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/22/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/22/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/07/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 10/07/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/22/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/22/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 10/22/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 10/22/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/22/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/22/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/22/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 10/22/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/03/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/03/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/03/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/03/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/03/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/03/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 11/07/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/19/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 11/19/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 11/19/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/13/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 02/03/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/03/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/09/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 03/09/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/12/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/12/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/15/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/15/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/15/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 04/15/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 04/21/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 04/21/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/21/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/21/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/29/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/29/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 04/29/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/12/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 11/15/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/15/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 11/15/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/15/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/15/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/15/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 11/15/2010