Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 06/16/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/16/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/16/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/16/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/16/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/16/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/19/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/19/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/19/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/19/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/19/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/19/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/19/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/19/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/23/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 06/23/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/23/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/23/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/23/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/23/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/26/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/26/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/07/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/07/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/07/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/07/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/07/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/10/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/10/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/10/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/10/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/10/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/17/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/17/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/17/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 07/17/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/24/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/24/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/24/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/24/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/24/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/24/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/24/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/24/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/31/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/31/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/31/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 07/31/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/31/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/31/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/31/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/17/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/17/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/17/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/17/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 09/17/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 09/17/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/17/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/17/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/06/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 10/14/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/14/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/05/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/05/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/05/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/01/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/01/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/01/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 12/01/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/01/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 12/01/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 12/01/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 12/16/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 12/16/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 01/13/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 01/13/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/22/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 02/22/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/22/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/04/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/04/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/04/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/15/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 03/15/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/15/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/18/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/18/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/18/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/18/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 03/18/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/18/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/18/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/25/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 03/25/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/20/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/20/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/20/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/20/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/20/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/20/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/20/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/06/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/06/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/13/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/13/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/13/2010
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/13/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/13/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/25/2010
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/25/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/25/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/25/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 05/25/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/25/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/27/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 05/27/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/14/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/14/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/24/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/01/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/01/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/30/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/30/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/30/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/30/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/30/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/16/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 09/28/2010