Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/07/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 01/26/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/09/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/16/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/23/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/23/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/30/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/30/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/30/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/01/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/01/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/02/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/02/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 04/23/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/23/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/23/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/23/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/30/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/30/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/30/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/30/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/30/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/30/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 04/30/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/30/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/30/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/30/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/06/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/06/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/06/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 05/06/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/06/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/06/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/06/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/06/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/06/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 05/06/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 05/06/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 05/06/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/06/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/12/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/12/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/12/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/21/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/21/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/21/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/21/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/21/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/21/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/21/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/21/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 06/03/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/03/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/03/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/03/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/03/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/03/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/03/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/10/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/10/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/10/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 06/10/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/10/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/10/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/10/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 06/15/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/15/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/15/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 06/15/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/18/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/26/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/26/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 06/26/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/26/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 07/08/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/08/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/08/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/08/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/08/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/08/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/10/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/15/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/21/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/21/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/21/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 07/27/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/27/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/28/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/28/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/28/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/28/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/28/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/30/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/09/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 09/09/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/09/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/09/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/09/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 09/10/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/10/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/14/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/17/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/25/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/25/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/01/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 10/01/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/20/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/20/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 11/02/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 11/02/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 11/16/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/19/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 11/19/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 03/10/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/12/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/25/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/13/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/20/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/20/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/20/2010
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/28/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/28/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 04/28/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/28/2010
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 05/04/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/04/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/06/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/06/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/06/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/11/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/11/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/12/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/12/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/19/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/19/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 05/19/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/20/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/10/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/22/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/13/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/20/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 08/10/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 09/14/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/22/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/15/2010