Refine your search

Showing 7 of 7 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
01/04/2011 Became Public Law No: 111-353.
01/04/2011 Signed by President.
12/29/2010 Presented to President.
12/21/2010 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 215 - 144 (Roll no. 661).(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H8861-8884)
12/19/2010 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.(text: CR 12/20/2010 S10824-10847)
06/09/2009 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 298 - 119, 2 Present (Roll no. 314).(text: CR H6345-6347)
06/08/2009 Introduced in House