Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 06/08/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/17/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/17/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/23/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/23/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/25/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/07/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 12/15/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/16/2010