Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/18/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/18/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/14/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/14/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 07/14/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/28/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/28/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/16/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/16/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/16/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/06/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/06/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/06/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/06/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 10/20/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/27/2010