Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/09/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 06/09/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/16/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/16/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 06/16/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/16/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 06/16/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/17/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/25/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/08/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/08/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/14/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/14/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/17/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/23/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/30/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/10/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/10/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/14/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/15/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/16/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/16/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/17/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/25/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/30/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/06/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/06/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/13/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/13/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/13/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/13/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/29/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/29/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 11/03/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/03/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/17/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/17/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/17/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/18/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/02/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/02/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/02/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 12/02/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 12/02/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/02/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/10/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/16/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 01/13/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/25/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/16/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/14/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/14/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 04/29/2010
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/29/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/27/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 06/17/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/13/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/13/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/22/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/29/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/29/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 09/28/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 11/16/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/16/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/29/2010