Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 06/09/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/23/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/24/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/07/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/10/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/10/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/17/2009