Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 06/09/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/09/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 06/09/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/24/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/24/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/08/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/16/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/27/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/16/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/16/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/16/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/16/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 09/16/2009