Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/29/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 09/29/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 09/29/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/29/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/29/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/29/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/29/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/29/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/29/2009
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 09/29/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 10/01/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 10/01/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 10/01/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 10/01/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/08/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/08/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 10/08/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 10/08/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/08/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 10/08/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 10/15/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/15/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/15/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/06/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 11/06/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 11/06/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 11/06/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 11/06/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/06/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 11/06/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 11/06/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 11/06/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 11/06/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 11/06/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 11/06/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/06/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/06/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 11/06/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/06/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/06/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 11/17/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/17/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 11/17/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 11/17/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 11/19/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 12/03/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 12/11/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/19/2010