Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/19/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/19/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/19/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/19/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/19/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/19/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/19/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/19/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/19/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/19/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/19/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/19/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/19/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/19/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/19/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/19/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/19/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/19/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/19/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/19/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/19/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/19/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 06/19/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/19/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/19/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/19/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/19/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/19/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/19/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/19/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/19/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/19/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 06/19/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/19/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/19/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/19/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 06/19/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/19/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/19/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/19/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/19/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/19/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/19/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/19/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/19/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/19/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/19/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/19/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/19/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/19/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/19/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/24/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/24/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 06/24/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/26/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/26/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/26/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/26/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/26/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/07/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/08/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/08/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 07/17/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/17/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/17/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/17/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/17/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/23/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/23/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/23/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/10/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/10/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/27/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 10/27/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 10/27/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 11/04/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 11/04/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/17/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/17/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 11/17/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/17/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/17/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/17/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 11/17/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/09/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 12/09/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/09/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 12/09/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 12/09/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 12/09/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/15/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 12/16/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 01/26/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 01/26/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/03/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 02/03/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/03/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/02/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/02/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 03/02/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 03/23/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/21/2010