Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/25/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/07/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/08/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/23/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/17/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/17/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 09/17/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/23/2009